Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midflorida Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Dennard Angela Mitchell, Dennard Norman Lee, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 28, 2017 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Date: January 08, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: November 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT WITH STAY OF EXECUTION | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT WITH STAY OF EXECUTION | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT WITH STAY OF EXECUTION | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-NORMAN LEE DENNARD BY SERVING CHUCK RELO | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-ANGELA MITCHELL DENNARD BY SERVING CHUCK RELO | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER/RESPONSE FROM JUDGE-GRANTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.