Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Walker, Kimberly Kaye, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Wierenga, Barbara A., in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 DANA Y MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 DANA Y MOORE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2017 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
This complaint is regarding the inability to retrieve a document from the Document Service. The complainant suggests that the service may be down or busy and advises checking back later or contacting the Application Support Team. No specific dollar a...
MOTION TO COMPEL UPDATE DEPOSITION OF THE PLAINTIFF
Date: January 09, 2019PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DEFENSE EXPERT TESTIMONY REGARDING THE REASONABLENESS OF
Date: December 06, 2018AMENDED ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING MEDIATION
Date: October 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND DEFENDANTS FINAL ATTORNEYS FEES AND | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO FEES AND COSTS | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE= RECEIVED BY JUDGE | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FEES | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | RE NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 03/16/2020 09:00 AM | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 02/25/2020 09:00 AM | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.