Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stone Street Capital, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Berardi, Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 JAMES A YANCEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2017 |
CategoryOthbt - Business Transaction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
This complaint is a petition for approval of the transfer of payment rights under a structured settlement. Stone Street Capital, LLC is seeking approval from the court to transfer certain periodic payments from Nicole Berardi, the payee, to Stone Str...
FINAL ORDER APPROVING OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS
Date: January 16, 2018NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES
Date: November 13, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 13, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/23/2018 11:15 AM | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 04/23/2018 11:15 AM | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER APPROVING OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 01/11/2018 03:00 PM | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | RE NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING-DISCLOSURE STATEMENT-ATTACHED | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 01/04/2018 09:30 AM | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.