Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Donald Prescott By And Through His Daughter And Power Of Attorney Denise Bruce, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case against Brandywine Convalescent Center, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 07, 2017 |
CategoryNegnh - Negligence Nursing Home |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: November 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 11/19/2018 09:30 AM | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 11/19/2018 09:30 AM | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS ELECTRONIC MAIL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK BRANDYWINE CONVALESCENT CENTER INC | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.