Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Akins Ronald, filed a(n) Mand - Mandamus case against State Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 30 ELLEN S MASTERS presiding.
Case Number |
Judge30 ELLEN S MASTERS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2017 |
CategoryMand - Mandamus |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT SIX-MONTH PRISON ACCOUNT STATEMENT | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNPAID FILING FEE | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM DEPUTY CLERK RE: INDIGENCY | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | INMATE AFFIDAVIT FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.