Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rivera, Edwin, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2017 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: February 09, 2018MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY
Date: August 17, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE-RECEIVED BY JUDGE | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLIANT AND DISCOVERY | |
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANT AND | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.