Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By Through Under And Against The Herein Named Individual Defendants Who Are Not Kno, Kuhl Dale R, Kuhl Wanda, Ruby Lake Homeowners Association Inc, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2017 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
NOTICE OF CONCILIATION CONFERENCE
Date: August 28, 2017AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: July 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF CLERK'S DEFAULT - RUBY LAKE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 01/22/2018 11:30 AM | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO COORDINATE A CONCILATION CONFERENCE | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAITNIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS DEMAND FOR WRITTEN VERIFICATION OF DEBT AND PAYOFF FIGURES | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.