Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brian L Rosaler, Esq, against All Other Unknown Parties, Fields, Pearline, Unknown Spouse Of Pearline Fields, Unknown Tenants In Possession 1, Unknown Tenants In Possession 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mtge Frcl Homestead Res2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 22 ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 23 SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: March 28, 2023PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 30
Date: May 26, 2023RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Doc # 37
Date: September 11, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 26
Date: May 09, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 15
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 17
Date: March 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Doc # 20 WITH ATTACHED BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: March 03, 2023SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 12 02032023 Party: FIELDS, PEARLINE
Date: February 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 38 Party: FIELDS, PEARLINE Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 1
Date: September 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES Doc # 24
Date: March 28, 2023SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 32 8:23-BK-02928 Party: FIELDS, PEARLINE
Date: July 11, 2023SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 13 02032023 Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 1
Date: February 07, 2023NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER Doc # 3 FORM B
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT Doc # 8 B MORTGAGE
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT Doc # 9 C CORPORATE ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE
Date: January 30, 2023PLTF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON LAST OF ALL NAMED DEF Doc # 14
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 34 ORDER DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER 23 BK 02928 CPM
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Doc # 21
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 25 05042023 2:45 VIA ZOOM
Date: March 29, 2023SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 11 Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 1
Date: January 30, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: January 30, 2023NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 29 07122023 10:00AM
Date: May 12, 2023PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET Doc # 4 FORM A
Date: January 30, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM Doc # 5
Date: January 30, 2023LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 6 Vol./Book 22332, Page 18, 1 pages
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT Doc # 7 A LOAN AGREEMENT
Date: January 30, 2023SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 10 Party: FIELDS, PEARLINE
Date: January 30, 2023COMPLAINT Doc # 2 WITH ATTACHMENT
Date: January 30, 2023LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 6
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Doc # 37 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 38 Party: FIELDS, PEARLINE Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION 1 | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER (R) Doc # 36 VACATING JUDGMENT DISMISSING CASE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS AND RETURNING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS Vol./Book 22559, Page 529, 2 pages | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATE CASE CLOSURE (UCR) | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE MOTION Doc # 35 TO VACATE JUDGMENT, DISMISS CASE, DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS Party: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 34 ORDER DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER 23 BK 02928 CPM | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION - REOPEN FEE DUE Doc # 33 PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE Party: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY SALE CANCELLED PER SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Judge: ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.