Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Anna Judd Rosenberg, against Clerk Of The Circuit Court Pinellas County Florida, Rogers, James Stuart, Rogers, Jessica Lynn, Rogers, Stuart, Jr, Salkowski, Michael Lynn, (total of 10) See All represented by Jay D Passer, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAMSBERGER, THOMAS M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mtge Frcl Homestead Res2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 47 AND TIME
Date: October 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES Doc # 52
Date: October 24, 2023NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 50 ORIGINAL NOTE ORIGINAL RECORDED MORTGAGE WITH ATTACHED SCHEDULE A
Date: October 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 55 PROPOSED ORDER RCVD BY COURT 12212023 | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 54 PLTFS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 53 12192023 11:00 TELEPHONIC | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES Doc # 52 | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 51 ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 50 ORIGINAL NOTE ORIGINAL RECORDED MORTGAGE WITH ATTACHED SCHEDULE A | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 47 AND TIME | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 45 OF FORECLOSURE ETC Party: WELLS FARGO BANK NA | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 46 WITH ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE ETC | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT Doc # 49 AS TO RECORD TITLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.