Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Zaleski, Andrea, Zaleski, Lucian, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by John W Windle, against National General Insurance Company, represented by Charles Andrew Tharp, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Doc # 2
Date: January 30, 2023REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 7
Date: January 30, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 13
Date: February 16, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: January 30, 2023SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 3 Party: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 30, 2023DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 11
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 8 AND EMAIL DESIGNATION Party: ZALESKI, ANDREA Party: ZALESKI, LUCIAN
Date: February 01, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 6
Date: January 30, 2023ORDER Doc # 14 ON MASS DISCOVERY HEARING (IN PERSON) 3/16
Date: February 19, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 5
Date: January 30, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 15 WITHOUT PREJUDICE Party: ZALESKI, LUCIAN
Date: March 13, 2023MOTION PROTECTIVE ORDER Doc # 10 Party: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE Doc # 4 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 2021-017
Date: January 30, 2023COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 15 WITHOUT PREJUDICE Party: ZALESKI, LUCIAN | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING | |
February 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER Doc # 14 ON MASS DISCOVERY HEARING (IN PERSON) 3/16 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 13 | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PRIMARY JUDICIAL OFFICER CHANGE (UCR) | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DIVISIONAL ASSIGNMENT CHANGE (UCR) | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 12 PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Party: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 11 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION PROTECTIVE ORDER Doc # 10 Party: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 8 AND EMAIL DESIGNATION Party: ZALESKI, ANDREA Party: ZALESKI, LUCIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.