Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Royal Restorations Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Stephen J Bagge, Esq, against Massarsky, Doris, Silverman, Deborah, represented by Philip G Dragonetti, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAMSBERGER, THOMAS M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mtge Frcl Other Real Prop1 $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 7 Party: MASSARSKY, DORIS
Date: January 27, 2023SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 8 Party: SILVERMAN, DEBORAH
Date: January 27, 2023LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 6 Vol./Book 22331, Page 1236, 2 pages
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PROVIDE STATUS UPDATE Doc # 26 | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 25 8032023 12:00 VIA ZOOM (AMENDED) | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 24 | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 23 | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER Doc # 22 ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF 06092023 | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 21 PROPOSED ORDER | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 20 | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 19 | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 18 | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.