Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mclaughlin, Daniel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by W Thomas Wadley, against Progressive Direct Insurance, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with Amy M. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy M. Williams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Daniel McLaughlin against Progressive Direct Auto, a foreign corporation. The complaint alleges bodily injuries caused by the negligence of Nanette Miranda Jones, resulting in hospitalization, medical and nursing care, loss...
SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 3 Party: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT AUTO
Date: September 26, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 5
Date: October 21, 2022ORDER TO PROVIDE STATUS UPDATE Doc # 14
Date: April 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PROVIDE STATUS UPDATE Doc # 14 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 13 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 11 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 12 OF PARTY Party: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT AUTO | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 10 11222022 Party: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PLURIES SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 9 Party: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 7 (SECOND) | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PLURIES SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 8 Party: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 5 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 6 Party: PROGRESSIVE DIRECT AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.