Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bambace, Lisa, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Russell L Cheatham Iii, Esq, against Hsbc Bank Usa National Association Under The Pooling And Serviceing Agreement Dated As Of August 1 2006 Fremont Home Loan Trust 2006 B, Mortage Electronic Registration System Inc As Nominee For Fremont Investment And Loan, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mtge Frcl Other Real Prop1 $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
EXHIBIT Doc # 6 B MORTGAGE
Date: September 23, 2022LIS PENDENS Doc # 9 FEE NEEDS TO BE PAID NOT RECORDED
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT Doc # 7 C MORTGAGE
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 22 QUIETING TITLE Vol./Book 22287, Page 973, 2 pages | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 20 12082022 10:45 TELEPHONIC | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 21 PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 19 (DEFAULT) Party: BAMBACE, LISA | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED Doc # 17 WITH MOTION Party: HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK DEFAULT - ENTERED Doc # 18 WITH MOTION Party: MORTAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM INC | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 16 WI ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT Vol./Book 22253, Page 1308, 2 pages | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 15 10122022 Party: MORTAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM INC | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 14 10122022 Party: MORTAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.