Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lapointe, Renot, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by E Lynn Gibbons, against Duke Energy Florida Llc, Fca Construction And Sons Inc, Johnson, Shane, Individually, Weekley Homes Llc, represented by Andrew J Lewis, Esq, Thomas Robert Unice Jr, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2022 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 3 Party: JOHNSON, SHANE, INDIVIDUALLY
Date: February 10, 2022SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 4 Party: DUKE ENERGY FLORIDA LLC
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT Doc # 21 A - COMPLAINT Party: WEEKLEY HOMES LLC
Date: March 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION Doc # 49
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 47
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 46
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 40 W/ ATTD UNSIGNED SUBPOENAS
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 39
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 38
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 41 TO FCA CONSTRUCTION & SONS INC
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 35 Party: FCA CONSTRUCTION AND SONS INC
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Doc # 36 Party: FCA CONSTRUCTION AND SONS INC
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 31
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.