Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Eckels, Myrna, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Water Medic Inc, Water Medic, Inc., represented by Steven K Jonas, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims 5 - $5,001 - $8,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
EXHIBIT Doc # 7 D Party: ECKELS, MYRNA
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 8 E Party: ECKELS, MYRNA
Date: August 16, 2021COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE Doc # 9 Party: ECKELS, MYRNA
Date: August 16, 2021CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP Doc # 13
Date: August 19, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 2
Date: August 16, 2021NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 12 VIA CERTIFIED MAIL Party: WATER MEDIC INC
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 10
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 5 B Party: ECKELS, MYRNA
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 4 A Party: ECKELS, MYRNA
Date: August 16, 2021STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 6 C Party: ECKELS, MYRNA
Date: August 16, 2021DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 3 Party: ECKELS, MYRNA
Date: August 16, 2021ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT Doc # 17 PRIN 3000.00/COSTS 300.00
Date: November 15, 2021DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 16 Party: WATER MEDIC INC
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 15 Party: WATER MEDIC INC
Date: September 16, 2021SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 20 Party: ECKELS, MYRNA
Date: January 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 20 Party: ECKELS, MYRNA | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIP FOR PAYMENT Doc # 17 PRIN 3000.00/COSTS 300.00 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Doc # 19 | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL Doc # 18 | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 16 Party: WATER MEDIC INC | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 15 Party: WATER MEDIC INC | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED Doc # 14 1_9214890194038347239431_202108_21-007908-SC | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP Doc # 13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.