Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jorge L Palma, Esq, against Mcgregor, Spencer, represented by Ryan N Singleton, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. against the defendant, Spencer McGregor, in the County Court of Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant failed to pay the amount due on a credit account that was or...
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 6 B - SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT ACTIVITY
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 5 A - BILL OF SALE
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 11 | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 10 WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 9 10/04/2021 Party: MCGREGOR, SPENCER | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT Doc # 8 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 7 Party: MCGREGOR, SPENCER | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 6 B - SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT ACTIVITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.