Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Juan G Andreu, Esq, against Bruce, Debbie, represented by David C Hicks, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims 5 - $5,001 - $8,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 2
Date: June 30, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 19 Party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA
Date: July 08, 2022JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 16 FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DEFT COUNSEL
Date: January 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 21 WITH ATTACHED MILITARY STATUS REPORT
Date: July 08, 2022DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 17 AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT
Date: January 17, 2022AGREEMENT Doc # 13 (STIPULATED)
Date: January 06, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 22 OF NON-PAYMENT Vol./Book 22142, Page 1738, 1 pages
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 10 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES Party: BRUCE, DEBBIE
Date: November 22, 2021MOTION Doc # 14 TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION
Date: January 06, 2022ORDER GRANTING Doc # 18 COUNSEL'S JOINT STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY
Date: January 20, 2022ALIAS SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 9 11152021 Party: BRUCE, DEBBIE
Date: November 17, 2021NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 11 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: December 14, 2021SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED Doc # 3 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: June 30, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 5 A - ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT Doc # 12 OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 6 Party: BRUCE, DEBBIE
Date: August 12, 2021REQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR Doc # 7 Party: BRUCE, DEBBIE
Date: October 13, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 4
Date: June 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS NOT ISSUED Doc # 3 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 22 OF NON-PAYMENT Vol./Book 22142, Page 1738, 1 pages | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 19 Party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 21 WITH ATTACHED MILITARY STATUS REPORT | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT Doc # 20 | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 18 COUNSEL'S JOINT STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPEN - CLOSED | |
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 16 FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DEFT COUNSEL | |
January 17, 2022 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 17 AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.