Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Indira Agrenot Gonzalez, Esq, against Spallone, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by LVNV Funding LLC against Anthony Spallone in the County Court in and for Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant failed to pay the amount due and owing on a credit account issued by Credit One Ban...
COMPLAINT E-FILED Doc # 2
Date: June 30, 2021ALIAS SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 03292022 Party: SPALLONE, ANTHONY
Date: March 29, 2022SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 7 Party: SPALLONE, ANTHONY
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 15 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 14 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT Doc # 12 | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FROM SC PRETRIAL Doc # 13 | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: BEDINGHAUS, SUSAN |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 03292022 Party: SPALLONE, ANTHONY | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 10 | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR Doc # 8 Party: LVNV FUNDING LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.