Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Crookshanks, Fe, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by James S Constable, Esq, against Heritage Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by John Patino, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: September 07, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE Doc # 8 OF CHANGE OF RECORD ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: February 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 8 OF CHANGE OF RECORD ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 7 COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CONDITION PRECEDENT UNDER FLORIDA STATUTE 627.70152 W/ATTACHMENT
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 6
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 5 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Party: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 4 Party: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 3
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.