Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Montes, Yajaira, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Marc B Parish, Esq, against Douglas, Dennis, Douglas, Donna, Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Michael R Wallace, Esq, Troy J Mcritchie, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 11 Party: DOUGLAS, DONNA
Date: September 07, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: September 07, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 55
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 58 (CROSS-)
Date: March 10, 2022RESPONSE Doc # 56 (DEFT) TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 01, 2022RESPONSE Doc # 51 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 03, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 34
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 45 (UNSIGNED)
Date: December 22, 2021RESPONSE Doc # 50 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 01, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 31
Date: December 09, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 52
Date: February 14, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 39
Date: December 14, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 40 (AMENDED)
Date: December 14, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 26
Date: October 26, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 27
Date: October 26, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 57 (VIDEO)
Date: March 10, 2022NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 49 (DEFENDANT)
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 47 RESPONSES TO DEFT REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 11, 2022NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 48
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 46
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 54
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 44
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 36
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 35
Date: December 14, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 41
Date: December 14, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 42 (AMENDED)
Date: December 14, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 38
Date: December 14, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 37
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 30 11032021 W/ATTACHED SUBPOENAS
Date: November 03, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 43 12142021
Date: December 14, 2021DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 32 PLAINTIFF S RESPONSE TO
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE Doc # 23
Date: October 26, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 28
Date: October 26, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 25
Date: October 26, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 29
Date: October 26, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 33
Date: December 09, 2021ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 19 Party: DOUGLAS, DENNIS Party: DOUGLAS, DONNA
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 17 Party: DOUGLAS, DONNA
Date: October 05, 2021ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 24 Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: October 26, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 21
Date: October 11, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 20
Date: October 07, 2021SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 15 09152021 Party: DOUGLAS, DONNA
Date: September 20, 2021SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 16 09152021 Party: DOUGLAS, DENNIS
Date: September 20, 2021SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 14 09152021 Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 20, 2021COMPLAINT E-FILED Doc # 2 AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL w/ STATEMENT OF INSURANCE DISCLOSURE ATTACHED
Date: September 07, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 12 Party: DOUGLAS, DENNIS
Date: September 07, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 13 Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 07, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 10 AS TO-GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 07, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 9 A-DONNA DOUGLAS
Date: September 07, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 8 AS TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 07, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 7 AS TO DENNIS DOUGLAS
Date: September 07, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 6 AS TO DONNA DOUGLAS
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 5 AS TO GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 4 AS TO DENNIS DOUGLAS
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 3 AS TO DONNA DOUGLAS
Date: September 07, 2021COMPLAINT E-FILED Doc # 2 WITH ATTACHMENT
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 58 (CROSS-)
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 57 (VIDEO)
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 56 (DEFT) TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 55
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 54
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 53 PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS DONNA DOUGLAS; DENNIS DOUGLAS INTERROGATORIES
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 52
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 51 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 50 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 49 (DEFENDANT)
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.