Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ferguson, Monna Lou, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chad M Pilon, Esq, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Kathleen Frank Yelverton, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 2 Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: August 13, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 22 03222021 1:00 (VIA ZOOM)
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 26 OF HEARING 10252021
Date: October 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 45 OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04052022
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION REPORT Doc # 44
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Doc # 43 FOR COPIES
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 42 TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Doc # 40 (AMENDED) 04042022 11:45 (TELEPHONIC)
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Doc # 41 04052022 3:30 (AMENDED)
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 39 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 38 (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 37 12022021 FROM DEFENSE COUNSEL ONLY
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 36
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.