Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of St Petersburg, City Of St Petersburg A Political Subdivision Of The State Of Florida, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Matthew D Weidner, Esq, against Ford, Terry L, Unknown Person In Possession Of The Property, represented by George K Rahdert, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAMSBERGER, THOMAS M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property Other1 - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 4
Date: August 11, 2021COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: August 11, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 6 Party: FORD, TERRY L
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 22 OF TELEPHONIC HEARING 03302022
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 21 IN OPPOSITION TO PLTF MOTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 20 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 19 03302022 2:00 TELEPHONIC
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 12 Party: CITY OF ST PETERSBURG
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 14 OF CODE ENFORCEMENT LIENS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 13 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 18 OF REASONABLE ATTYS FEES
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 16 A - ORDER IMPOSING LIEN W/ ATTACHMENTS Party: CITY OF ST PETERSBURG
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Doc # 17 /COST
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.