Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thackrah, Joel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sumeet Kaul, against Graves, Stephanie, represented by Cristina A Blunt, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT Doc # 3
Date: August 11, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 5
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE Doc # 24 OF SETTLEMENT
Date: January 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 24 OF SETTLEMENT
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 23
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 22
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 21 AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 20
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 19
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Doc # 17
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 18 OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO STRIKE Doc # 16
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 15
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.