Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Melissa Konick, Esq, against Barclays Bank Delaware, Forcella, Albert S, Jr, Green, Daniel L, Green, Richard E, Grider, Pamela M, (total of 11) See All represented by Daniel J Greenberg, Isaac Manzo, Esq, John F Rudy, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, CYNTHIA J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNEWTON, CYNTHIA J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 8 Party: GRIDER, PAMELA M
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 39 02152022 10:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: November 19, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 43 Party: FORCELLA, ALBERT S, JR
Date: March 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 44 Party: GREEN, DANIEL L
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 43 Party: FORCELLA, ALBERT S, JR
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Doc # 42 03112022 W/ ATTACHMENTS
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Doc # 41 PLTF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 40
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 39 02152022 10:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 38
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 34 Party: GRIDER, PAMELA M
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED Doc # 32 Party: GRIDER, PAMELA M Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS ETC ESTATE OF PATRICIA R GREEN DECEASED Party: UNKNOWN SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF PATRICIA R GREEN
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION - EMAILED TO PUBLISHER AND ATTY OR FILER Doc # 33
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.