Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Moorings Of Pinellas County Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Daniel J Greenberg, against Goremykina, Yulia, Lanni, Ann, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryReal Prop - Mortgage Foreclosure - County Up To $15,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 2
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 14 W/ ATTACHED STATUS REPORTS
Date: April 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (R) Doc # 18 AND CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 21543, Page 1671, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
COUNTY - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING Doc # 19
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 17 IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR A DEFAULT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Doc # 16 Party: GOREMYKINA, YULIA
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 14 W/ ATTACHED STATUS REPORTS
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT Doc # 13 NOT ENTERED / NON MILITARY AFFD NOT SIGNED BY ATTORNEY Party: THE MOORINGS OF PINELLAS COUNTY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Doc # 15 Party: GOREMYKINA, YULIA Party: LANNI, ANN
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 12 01272021 FKA ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION Party: LANNI, ANN
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 03012021 Party: GOREMYKINA, YULIA
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 2
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.