Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sulyn Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Astarita, Jessica Marie, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryResidential Eviction Damages $0 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 6 Party: ASTARITA, JESSICA MARIE
Date: January 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | COUNTY - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 9 ASTARITA, JESSICA MARIE Vol./Book 21969, Page 374, 4 pages | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 8 | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 7 01162021 Party: ASTARITA, JESSICA MARIE | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 6 Party: ASTARITA, JESSICA MARIE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
LEASE Doc # 5
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
THREE DAY NOTICE Doc # 4
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 3
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT - II COUNTS Doc # 2
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.