Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Huberty, Phylicia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Huberty, Randall, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JACK, ELIZABETH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACK, ELIZABETH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage - With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Doc # 19
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION Doc # 18 Vol./Book 21543, Page 1956, 4 pages
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
FAMILY - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE Doc # 20
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR FINAL HEARING Doc # 17 VIA ZOOM 05042021 3:45
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Doc # 16 Party: HUBERTY, RANDALL
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 15 CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - RESPONDENT Doc # 14
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - PETITIONER Doc # 13
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO ATTEND DIVORCE A CHILD'S VIEW Doc # 12
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE Doc # 11
Judge: JACK, ELIZABETH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.