Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ewell, Lisa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James W Holliday, against Clark, Marion, represented by Donna Ferrell, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a civil action filed by Lisa Ewell against Marion Clark for auto negligence. The damages being claimed exceed $30,000. On April 10, 2018, Marion Clark allegedly drove a motor vehicle at an intersection in St. Petersburg, Pinellas Co...
ATTACHMENT Doc # 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 15, 2021AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 29 (SECOND) 04192022 1:30
Date: December 01, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 15
Date: March 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION REPORT Doc # 33 -IMPASSE
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 32 THIRD AMENDED TO ZOOM LINK ONLY
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 31 A - PROPOSED ORDER/UNSIGNED AGREED MANDATORY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Party: EWELL, LISA
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 30 OF ATTEMPTS TO COMPLY W/ CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 29 (SECOND) 04192022 1:30
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 28 OF MEDIATION SET 11182021
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 27 (AMENDED) 11182021 1:30 (VIA ZOOM)
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 26
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Doc # 25 Party: FERRELL, DONNA, ESQ
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 24 07282021 W/ATTACHED SUBPOENAS
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.