Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
South State Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Antonio R Perez, against Florida Department Of Corrections, Moncalieri, Elizabeth M, Moncalieri, William B, Southern Owners Insurance Company, State Of Florida, (total of 7) See All represented by Anthony Brian Coniglio, Daniel J Greenberg, Hastings Jones, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure action filed by South State Bank, National Association against defendants Elizabeth M. Moncalieri, William B. Moncalieri, State of Florida, Florida Department of Corrections, Southern Owners Insurance Company,...
LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 3
Date: January 15, 2021COMPLAINT Doc # 4
Date: January 15, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING Doc # 34 PARTY Party: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Date: March 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) OTHER SALE CANCELLED PER FILING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Doc # 48
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Doc # 49
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 47
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 46 ***ESF PAID***
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 45 $59 SERVICE CHARGE FEE DUE/EMAILED ON 8/11/21
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 43 RECEIVED BY COURT ON 8/10/21
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Doc # 44 11/10/21 $124,433.36 Party: MONCALIERI, ELIZABETH M Vol./Book 21670, Page 913, 7 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL - CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.