Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of St Petersburg, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Matthew D Weidner, Esq, against Evans, Doris, First Magnus Financial Corporation, Unknown Person In Possession, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property Other1 - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the City of St. Petersburg, Florida against Doris Evans, First Magnus Financial Corporation, and an unknown person in possession of a property located at 3042 29th Ave S., Saint Petersburg, FL 33712. The co...
LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 2
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 3 Party: UNKNOWN PERSON IN POSSESSION
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 4 Party: FIRST MAGNUS FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Doc # 13 Party: FIRST MAGNUS FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Date: February 08, 2021NOTICE Doc # 10 OF SCRIVNER'S ERROR IN COMPLAINT
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED Doc # 15 PROPOSED Party: CITY OF ST PETERSBURG
Date: June 14, 2021LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 2 Vol./Book 21348, Page 466, 1 pages
Date: January 15, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (R) Doc # 9 (CORRECTED) Vol./Book 21364, Page 1426, 1 pages
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED Doc # 16 Party: FIRST MAGNUS FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Date: June 16, 2021PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 18 30 DAYS
Date: July 02, 2021ANSWER Doc # 14 Party: EVANS, DORIS
Date: March 05, 2021SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 8 Party: EVANS, DORIS
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING Doc # 11 Party: UNKNOWN PERSON IN POSSESSION
Date: January 28, 2021SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 12 01282021 Party: EVANS, DORIS
Date: February 01, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 5 Party: EVANS, DORIS
Date: January 15, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 7 A CERTIFICATES OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: January 15, 2021COMPLAINT Doc # 6
Date: January 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (R) Doc # 19 WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 21695, Page 1124, 1 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 18 30 DAYS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED Doc # 16 Party: FIRST MAGNUS FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION - EMAILED TO PUBLISHER AND ATTY OR FILER Doc # 17 BUSINESS OBSERVER
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED Doc # 15 PROPOSED Party: CITY OF ST PETERSBURG
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Doc # 14 Party: EVANS, DORIS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Doc # 13 Party: FIRST MAGNUS FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 12 01282021 Party: EVANS, DORIS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 8 Party: EVANS, DORIS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.