Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Christina N Charlet, Esq, Erik Zogg, Esq, against Wieber, John, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by American Express National Bank against John Wieber, also known as John T Wieber. The plaintiff is a national bank located in Utah. The complaint alleges a breach of contract by the defendant. The action is based on a credit...
EXHIBIT Doc # 6 D - ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 28, 2018NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 14 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: September 11, 2020NOTICE Doc # 11 OF CHANGE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS
Date: June 18, 2020SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 10
Date: June 18, 2020EXHIBIT Doc # 5 C - CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT PART 2
Date: December 28, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 4 B - ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 28, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 3 A - CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 7 ISSUED Party: WIEBER, JOHN
Date: December 28, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 8 Party: WIEBER, JOHN
Date: May 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 14 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 13
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEW SECTION ASSIGNMENT PER AO Doc # 12 THIS CASE IS ASSIGNED TO SECTION 21, BUT WILL BE REASSIGNED TO SECTION 7 EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2021 PER AO 2020-022. MATTERS WILL CONTINUE TO BE HEARD BY THE SECTION 21 JUDGE UNTIL DECEMBER 31, 2020.
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer COVERT, THANE) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer COVERT, THANE)
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 11 OF CHANGE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 10
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 9
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 8 Party: WIEBER, JOHN
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 8Party: WIEBER, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.