Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Amy Concilio, Esq, against Caldato, Lucrecia, Mcnier, Howard E, Mcnier, Marie H, Palma Del Mar Condominium As No 2 Of St Petersburg Inc, Scudari, Joan, (total of 7) See All represented by Robert L Todd, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM Doc # 4
Date: December 28, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 2 W/ EXHIBITS ATTACHED
Date: December 28, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 7
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 15 ISSUED Party: SCUDARI, JOAN
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 12 ISSUED Party: MCNIER, HOWARD E
Date: December 28, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 5
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 13 ISSUED Party: MCNIER, MARIE H
Date: December 28, 2018PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET Doc # 8 FORM D
Date: December 28, 2018NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER Doc # 9 FORM C
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 10 ISSUED Party: CALDATO, LUCRECIA
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 19 010419 Party: SCUDARI, JOAN
Date: January 09, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 11 ISSUED Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUCRECIA CALDATO
Date: December 28, 2018CERTIFICATE Doc # 6 POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 20 010419 Party: MCNIER, MARIE H
Date: January 09, 2019SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 18 010419 FKA UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2 Party: SCUDARI, JOHN
Date: January 09, 2019SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 26 011519 Party: MCNIER, HOWARD E
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 27 Party: CALDATO, LUCRECIA
Date: January 29, 2019ANSWER Doc # 24 Party: MCNIER, MARIE H
Date: January 22, 2019ANSWER Doc # 23 Party: MCNIER, HOWARD E
Date: January 22, 2019SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 25 Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUCRECIA CALDATO
Date: January 29, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 29
Date: February 12, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 16 ISSUED Party: SCUDARI, JOHN
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 27 Party: CALDATO, LUCRECIA
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 26 011519 Party: MCNIER, HOWARD E
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 25 Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUCRECIA CALDATO
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 19 010419 Party: SCUDARI, JOAN
Date: January 09, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 20 010419 Party: MCNIER, MARIE H
Date: January 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 29
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 30 Vol./Book 20431, Page 2297, 3 pages
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 28
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 30Vol./Book 20431, Page 2297, 3 pages | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 29 | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 28 | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 26 011519 Party: MCNIER, HOWARD E
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 27 Party: CALDATO, LUCRECIA
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 25 Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUCRECIA CALDATO
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 27 Party: CALDATO, LUCRECIA
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.