Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Athene Annuity And Life Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Michelle Lewis, against Bennett, Joan, Bennett, Terry, Bennett, Terry, Personal Rep, Unknown Heirs Etc Of Travis Bennett Deceased, represented by Julia B Kite-Powell, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALLAN, LINDA R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage. The plaintiff, AAIA RML, LLC, is suing Terry Bennett, Joan Bennett, unknown heirs, beneficiaries, devisees, surviving spouse, grantees, assignee, lienors, creditors, trustees, and all ot...
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 10 ISSUED Party: BENNETT, TERRY
Date: December 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS Doc # 65
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 64 Vol./Book 20922, Page 234, 1 pages
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 63 BAY TO GULF HOLDINGS LLC
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 62
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 61 **ESF PAID**
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 61**ESF PAID** | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION Doc # 60 LOAN NUMBERS NOT COVERED UNDER RULE
Judge: ALLAN, LINDA R |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION Doc # 60LOAN NUMBERS NOT COVERED UNDER RULE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.