Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaportas, Louisa, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Eduardo R Latour, Esq, against Konger Coral Sea Aquarium Inc, Riverwalk Of Tarpon Springs Inc, represented by Jason R Hull, Esq, Jennifer J Seitz, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by Louisa Delaportas against Konger Coral Sea Aquarium, Inc. and Riverwalk of Tarpon Springs, Inc. The complaint alleges that the plaintiff suffered injuries due to a dangerous condition on the defendants' premises. The plaint...
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 7
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 4 ISSUED Party: RIVERWALK OF TARPON SPRINGS INC
Date: December 27, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: KONGER CORAL SEA AQUARIUM INC
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 38
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 38 | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 37 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 36 Vol./Book 20594, Page 917, 1 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 36Vol./Book 20594, Page 917, 1 pages | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 37PROPOSED ORDER | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 34
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 35 FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 35FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 34 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.