Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Abrams, Julia A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John F Mcguire, Esq, against Hossain, Mohammed I, Rasier-Dc Llc A Foreign Limited Liability Company, Rasier-Dc Llc  A Foreign Limited Liability Company, Uber Technologies Inc A Foreign Profit Corporation, Uber Technologies Inc  A Foreign Profit Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Erin M Diaz, Esq, Victoria S Luna, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Julia A. Abrams against Mohammed I. Hossain, Rasier-DC, LLC, and Uber Technologies, Inc. The complaint alleges that on September 7, 2018, Hossain, who was driving a 2014 Toyota vehicle, collided with Abrams' automobile at a...
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 63
Date: May 29, 2019NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Doc # 59 WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: May 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 78
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 76 Vol./Book 20862, Page 1812, 2 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 77 PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED BY COURT 01212020 W/ATTACHED COPY
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 76Vol./Book 20862, Page 1812, 2 pages | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 78 | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 77PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED BY COURT 01212020 W/ATTACHED COPY | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 75 FOR FINAL ORDER OD DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 74
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 73
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION Doc # 75FOR FINAL ORDER OD DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.