Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brooks, Lauren, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brandon F Jones, Esq, against Williams, Julie Ann, represented by Emily Silver, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEYER, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Lauren Brooks against Julie Ann Williams in the Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Williams, resulting in property damage to Brooks' vehi...
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 8
Date: December 26, 2018SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 10 011719 Party: WILLIAMS, JULIE ANN
Date: January 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 54 W/ PREJUDICE BY Party: BROOKS, LAUREN
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 53
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 52 OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE Doc # 52OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 51
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 51 | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 50 DID NOT REACH AGREEMENT
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 50DID NOT REACH AGREEMENT | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 49 - SIGNED SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM W/O DEPO
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 48 111519
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.