Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tonelli, Mike, Esq, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chris M Limberlopoulos, against Corbett, Kathleen A, represented by Michael Kraft, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAMSBERGER, THOMAS M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Jay Wolfson, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Corbett, against Kathleen A. Corbett. The complaint alleges negligence and vicarious liability in connection with a motor vehicle accident that occurred on ...
COMPLAINT Doc # 2 AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 37
Date: August 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 37
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) Doc # 36
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 34 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Doc # 35 MTN TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 33 03242020 2:00
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION Doc # 32 REQUESTED INFORMATION NOT COVERED WITHOUT MOTION TO DETERMINE
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK DENIAL OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION Doc # 32REQUESTED INFORMATION NOT COVERED WITHOUT MOTION TO DETERMINE | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 30 TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT W/ATTACHED EXHIBIT A - STIPULATION
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 29
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 31
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.