Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Christina N Charlet, Esq, against Bittle, Audrey A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CERTIFICATE Doc # 8 OF PLTFS ATTY
Date: April 17, 2018(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 21 Party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA
Date: November 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 7
Date: April 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 21 Party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 21Party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA | |
November 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Doc # 20
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Doc # 20 | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 19 SERVED ON JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 19SERVED ON JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Doc # 18 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A AND DEMAND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Doc # 18JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N A AND DEMAND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 17 ISSUED - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION-REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 16 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. GARNISHEE
Judge: DAY, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.