Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martin, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jodi Leisure, Jodi Leisure, Esq, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by J Emory Wood, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by David Martin against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The jurisdiction for this case is the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on June 23, 2017, a phantom driver ne...
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 11 RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY DEFT
Date: January 24, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 10
Date: January 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 16 W/PREJUDICE Party: MARTIN, DAVID
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 17
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 15
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 16W/PREJUDICEParty: MARTIN, DAVID | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 17 | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 15 | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 14
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 14 | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION Doc # 13 TO DEFTS INTERROGATORIES
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION Doc # 12 TO DEFTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.