Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Christina N Charlet, Esq, against Greif, Morgan G, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY, LORRAINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 5 123017 Party: GREIF, MORGAN G
Date: January 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 13
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 12 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 11
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 10 ATTACHED SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S MTN FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 7 (FINAL)
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 9 ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 8
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Doc # 6 TO REQUEST EXTENDED TIME TO RETAIN ATTY W/ATTACHMENT Party: GREIF, MORGAN G
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 5 123017 Party: GREIF, MORGAN G
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 A - CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT AND B - ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.