Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wynne, Tom, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Adamec, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY, LORRAINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the County Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, Tom Wynne, is seeking to evict the defendant, Melissa Adamec, from a property located at 1521 41st Street North, St...
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 6 122717 Party: ADAMEC, MELISSA
Date: January 03, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 5 Party: ADAMEC, MELISSA
Date: December 27, 2017ATTACHMENT Doc # 4 THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 14 IN FAVOR OF PLTF Vol./Book 19907, Page 1062, 1 pages
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 13
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 12
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 10 Party: ADAMEC, MELISSA
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE Doc # 11 FJ W/ ENV
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 9 COUNT 1
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 8
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 7 ENTERED
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 6 122717 Party: ADAMEC, MELISSA
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 5 Party: ADAMEC, MELISSA
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.