Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mechem, Dawn, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Neal J Gambler, Ii, against Nauti Nancys Inc, represented by Jennifer K Forte, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEYER, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by Dawn Mechem against Nauti Nancy's, Inc. d/b/a Nauti Nancy's Restaurant. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The incident giving rise to the cause of action occurred on December 17, 2016, at Nauti Nancy's ...
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION Doc # 35
Date: June 21, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 32 (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: June 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 60
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 59
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 60 | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 59 | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION REPORT Doc # 58
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT Doc # 58 | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 57 (DEFT)
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 57(DEFT) | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION Doc # 55
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION Doc # 56
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.