Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Robinson, Thelma, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by William H Winters, William H Winters, Esq, against City Of St Petersburg, represented by Joseph P Patner, Steven G Koeppel, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Doc # 57
Date: January 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 13 010218 Party: OLDSMAR LAND HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Date: January 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 72 CITY OF ST PETERSBURG Vol./Book 21057, Page 213, 2 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 73
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer WILLIAMS, AMY M)
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 71
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Doc # 70 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLTF
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 69 AS TO OLDSMAR LAND HOLDING CORPORATION Vol./Book 20550, Page 88, 1 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 70MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLTF | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 69AS TO OLDSMAR LAND HOLDING CORPORATIONVol./Book 20550, Page 88, 1 pages | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 68 FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO OLDSMAR LAND HOLDING CORPORATION
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION Doc # 68FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO OLDSMAR LAND HOLDING CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.