Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hatt, Calvin, Hatt, Joyce, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Manuel G Franco, against Standard Insurance Company, represented by Douglas C Saltarelli, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Joyce Hatt and her husband Calvin Hatt against The Standard Fire Insurance Company, also known as Travelers. The plaintiffs are seeking damages exceeding $15,000. The plaintiffs were residents of Pinellas County, Florida, a...
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 21 (AMENDED)
Date: November 16, 2018NOTICE Doc # 20 OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: September 07, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 19 012919 1:30
Date: September 07, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 16 (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: July 23, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 18
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 17 072318
Date: July 23, 2018NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 15
Date: June 05, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 13
Date: April 26, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 14 050318
Date: May 03, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 12 (CONSORTIUM)
Date: April 24, 2018ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 6 Party: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 05, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 8 (CONSORTIUM)
Date: February 05, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 9
Date: February 05, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 11
Date: April 24, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 7
Date: February 05, 2018DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 10
Date: February 05, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 2 AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL w/ EXHIBIT A ATTACHED
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 24 050219
Date: May 02, 2019NOTICE Doc # 25 (MEDIATORS) OF SETTLEMENT
Date: May 30, 2019AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 22 053019 1:30
Date: January 17, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 23
Date: April 25, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 27 WITH PREJUDICE
Date: May 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 27 WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 26
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 27WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 26 | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 25 (MEDIATORS) OF SETTLEMENT
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE Doc # 25(MEDIATORS) OF SETTLEMENT | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 24 050219
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 24050219 | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 23
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.