Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stopa, Mark P, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mark P Stopa, against Kevin Cannon, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAMSBERGER, THOMAS M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Mark P. Stopa against Isaac Manzo. Stopa alleges that in December 2016, he agreed to front $500,000 towards the purchase of a waterfront property in Madeira Beach, FL, as Cannon lacked the necessary funds. ...
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 15
Date: August 06, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 10
Date: February 13, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 11
Date: April 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 32 KEVIN CANNON Vol./Book 21172, Page 1617, 3 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 31
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M)
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 30 NO FORWARDING ADDRESS
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 29
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION Doc # 28 TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DEF-RESP'S MOTION Doc # 28TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 27
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 27 | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 26 OF DISQUALIFICATION
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.