Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Willnae Lacroix, against Curlew Landings South Homeowners Association Inc, Smith, Christine, Smith, Jerry L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal document related to a mortgage loan. The document includes definitions of various terms used in the document, such as "Security Instrument," "Borrower," "MERS," and "Lender." It also includes information about the property, ...
NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 36 ***ESF PAID***
Date: May 30, 2018REQUEST FOR SURPLUS TRUSTEE SENT TO STATE Doc # 43
Date: September 06, 2018CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 41 Vol./Book 20125, Page 626, 1 pages
Date: July 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED SURPLUS FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH STATE UNDER F.S.717 Doc # 46 2019 FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS DEPOSITED IN 2020
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
FS 717 FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS TO BE REPORTED AS UNCLAIMED
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 45
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 45 | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SURPLUS TRUSTEE SENT TO STATE Doc # 43
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 44
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SURPLUS TRUSTEE SENT TO STATE Doc # 43 | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 44 | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 41 Vol./Book 20125, Page 626, 1 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS Doc # 42
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.