Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tbf Financial Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ralph S Marcadis, Esq, against Keeling, Danny P, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ALLAN, LINDA R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALLAN, LINDA R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
ATTACHMENT Doc # 6 SUMMONS
Date: January 11, 2018DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 9 Party: KEELING, DANNY P
Date: February 16, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: KEELING, DANNY P
Date: December 27, 2017ORDER Doc # 25 RECLOSING CASE
Date: July 22, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 4 PURCHASE AGREEMENT
Date: December 27, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 27, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 3
Date: December 27, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 16 Vol./Book 20126, Page 2069, 1 pages
Date: July 03, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 7
Date: February 15, 2018MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 10 Party: TBF FINANCIAL LLC
Date: May 03, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 14 070318 9:00
Date: June 21, 2018SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION Doc # 18 SERVED
Date: September 27, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 22 FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 01, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 24 HEARING 121219 9:30
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 5 010618 Party: KEELING, DANNY P
Date: January 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT Doc # 13 AS TO CALCULATION OF INTEREST
Date: May 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT Doc # 12 OF PLTF
Date: May 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 11
Date: May 03, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 20 011819 9:00
Date: December 05, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 23 121219 9:30
Date: October 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 25 RECLOSING CASE
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer NEWTON, CYNTHIA J)
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 24 HEARING 121219 9:30
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 24HEARING 121219 9:30 | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 23 121219 9:30
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 23121219 9:30 | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 22 FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: NEWTON, CYNTHIA J |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 22FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.