Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Panagoulis, George, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Kelly C Culbertson, against Arthur, Catherine, Taylor, Kenneth P, Unknown Beneficiaries And Trustees Of The Paul Taylor Revocable Trust Etc, Unknown Beneficiaries And Trustees Of The Taylor Family Trust Etc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCAMPBELL, PAMELA AM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property Other1 - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal action filed by George Panagoulis to quiet and confirm his title to a property located in Pinellas County, Florida. The property is described as Dania Unit No. 1, Town Apartments No. 19, a Condominium, according to the Decla...
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 2 Party: PANAGOULIS, GEORGE
Date: September 14, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE Doc # 5 Vol./Book 19788, Page 913, 2 pages
Date: September 25, 2017PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT 090117
Date: August 25, 2017NOTICE PROPOSED
Date: July 21, 2017COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: July 21, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 21, 2017NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED - BUSINESS OBSERVER Party: CULBERTSON, KELLY C
Date: July 31, 2017CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 4 PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 1 ENTERED
Date: September 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE Doc # 5 Vol./Book 19788, Page 913, 2 pages
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 4 PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 6
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE Doc # 5Vol./Book 19788, Page 913, 2 pages | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 6 | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 4PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 3 Party: ARTHUR, CATHERINE Party: TAYLOR, KENNETH P Party: UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES AND TRUSTEES OF THE PAUL TAYLOR REVOCABLE TRUST ETC Party: UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES AND TRUSTEES OF THE TAYLOR FAMILY TRUST ETC
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 3Party: ARTHUR, CATHERINEParty: TAYLOR, KENNETH PParty: UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES AND TRUSTEES OF THE PAUL TAYLOR REVOCABLE TRUST ETCParty: UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES AND TRUSTEES OF THE TAYLOR FAMILY TRUST ETC | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 2 Party: PANAGOULIS, GEORGE
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 1 ENTERED
Judge: CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.