Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Third Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Cleveland, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nelson A Perez, against Chianchiano, Antoinette, Chianchiano, Gertrude Trudi, Distefano, Eugene, Harbor Crest 400 Property Owners Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAY, JACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Non-Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 19720, Page 540, 1 pages
Date: July 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Vol./Book 19720, Page 540, 1 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLEVol./Book 19720, Page 540, 1 pages | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALETHIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) REC VER | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Vol./Book 19649, Page 2579, 7 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.