Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na For Irwin Whole Loan Home Equity Trust 2004 A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jeremy Apisdorf, against Heckathorn, Jay E, Heckathorn, Theresa C, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MINKOFF, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMINKOFF, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure1 $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: HECKATHORN, JAY E Party: HECKATHORN, THERESA C
Date: February 02, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: December 30, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS Vol./Book 19538, Page 1556, 2 pages
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALW/O PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENSVol./Book 19538, Page 1556, 2 pages | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO SET CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: HECKATHORN, JAY E Party: HECKATHORN, THERESA C
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTEREDParty: HECKATHORN, JAY EParty: HECKATHORN, THERESA C | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 1 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 2 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 3 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT 4
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CHANGE ATTY/UPDATE INFORMATION AND E-MAIL
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT W/ATTACHED COPIES SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY Party: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Judge: MINKOFF, THOMAS H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.